IL HR0582 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Supreme Court and relevant authorities to require, as a consistent part of continuing education, LGBTQ+ and HIV cultural competency education for all attorneys, judges, and courtroom staff in the State of Illinois.
Title
IL COURTS-LGBTQ+ & HIV ED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-03-13 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-004-000 |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-03-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=582&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0582.htm |