IL HR0531 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the members of the General Assembly to not implement any cuts to State aid to municipalities unless those cuts are matched by equally proportionate reductions in fees for financial services paid by State agencies, including fees for all financial services, including cash management, investment management, and debt management. Urges all State agencies to request that the firms that provide them financial services reduce fees by an equally proportionate amount if the General Assembly cuts State aid to municipalities and to not make any payments to firms that refuse to reduce fees for financial services by the set amount until they have first met all of their other financial obligations, including fully funding public services and State aid to municipalities, paying workers, making pension fund contributions, and paying other legitimate bills.
Title
FINANCIAL SVC FEE REDUCTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-005-000 |
2015-05-29 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=531&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0531.htm |