IL HR0341 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the 4th Thursday in May 2019 and the 4th Thursday in May 2020 as "State of Illinois Day of Gratitude".
Title
ILLINOIS DAY OF GRATITUDE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=341&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0341.htm |