IL HR0318 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to take action in passing the necessary legislation to advance the human rights and protections of the immigrant community in the United States.
Title
PROTECT IMMIGRANT COMMUNITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 005-003-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=318&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0318.htm |