IL HR0305 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 10, 2019 "Transcontinental Railroad Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
TRANSCONTINENTAL RAILROAD DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=305&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0305.htm |