IL HR0270 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commends the Illinois Alliance of Boys & Girls Clubs on their dedication to the youth of Illinois and applauds all of the 2019 Illinois Youth of the Year nominees.
Title
COMMEND-BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS ILL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2019-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-04-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=270&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0270.htm |