IL HR0266 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress and the President to upgrade the Silver Star bestowed to former U.S. Army Special Forces Captain William L. Albracht for his actions at Firebase Kate on October 28 - November 2, 1969 to the Medal of Honor.
Title
URGE FED - ALBRACHT MOH
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2013-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=266&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0266.htm |