IL HR0260 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Department of Children and Family Services' compliance with its obligations to protect the Indian children in care and their families.
Title
AUDIT-DCFS-INDIAN CHILDREN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=260&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0260.htm |