IL HR0226 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-13)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-13)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Calls upon the Illinois Department of Employment Security to make an immediate public commitment to reopen their public-access public employment offices to provide face-to-face help to Illinois residents who urgently need assistance. Calls upon all of the other departments of the State of Illinois to provide the Department of Employment Security with advice, technical assistance, and guidance on how to safely reopen public-access office spaces under current conditions. Expresses support for the working people of Illinois and recognizes the stressful circumstances of operating a publicly accessible office in a time of pandemic.
Title
IDES-OPEN PUBLIC OFFICES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-05-29 | House | Resolution Adopted 108-000-001 |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-12 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-05-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-04-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |