IL HR0191 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares August 2021 as Spinal Muscular Atrophy Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
SPINAL ATROPHY AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-20 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=191&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0191.htm |