IL HR0152 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 116-001-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 116-001-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaims May of 2009 as Esophageal Cancer Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
ESOPHAGEAL CANCER MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-30 | Resolution Adopted 116-001-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-04-22 | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000 | |
2009-03-17 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-17 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-16 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=152&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0152.htm |