IL HR0141 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March of 2015 as Poison Prevention Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
POISON PREVENTION MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-03-11 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=141&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0141.htm |