IL HR0132 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 14, 2023 as "Equal Pay Day". Encourages the citizens of this State to learn about the pay gap that women experience in society and to learn about these various dates that bring attention to the pay gap that specific groups experience.
Title
EQUAL PAY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-05-18 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2023-03-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 015-008-000 |
2023-03-20 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=132&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0132.htm |