IL HR0116 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Barn 13 at the Illinois State Fairgrounds in Springfield as the J. Garrett and John J. Tolan Barn in recognition of the contributions of J. Garrett and John Tolan to agriculture in the State.
Title
GARRETT AND JOHN TOLAN BARN
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Brauer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2011-05-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-05-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=116&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0116.htm |