IL HR0106 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Acknowledges the seriousness of mental health issues in Illinois and strives to improve awareness and treatment of these issues. Urges the members of the General Assembly to have discussions and forums with their communities to promote awareness of mental health issues and access to mental health resources. Encourages the members of the General Assembly and all school districts in Illinois to post information on mental health issues and local treatment resources on their public websites. Encourages all school districts in Illinois to implement mental health screenings to properly identify students with mental health problems. Encourages the federal government to improve mental health awareness, treatment, and funding to improve the lives of citizens struggling with mental health issues.
Title
MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-06 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=106&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0106.htm |