IL HR0105 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the month of March of 2017 as Social Work Month in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOCIAL WORK MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseResolution Adopted
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback