IL HR0094 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages the Illinois State Board of Education and the Illinois Department of Public Health to work in collaboration with local school districts to develop and implement plans for the testing of Legionella.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LEGIONELLA TESTING - SCHOOLS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-09HouseResolution Adopted as Amended
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-22HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback