IL HR0090 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares African Methodist Episcopal (AME) Day on March 27, 2021. Further congratulates the AME Church on their 205th anniversary.
Title
AME CHURCH DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-07-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |