IL HR0071 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Biden Administration to adjust federal funding levels for undercounted areas and to see that Illinois receives the funds appropriate to their actual population, not the undercount. Resolves that the State of Illinois should take all appropriate steps to ensure undercounted communities within the State receive their proper funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

US CENSUS-FUNDING-UNDERCOUNT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2023-06-26HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2023-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2023-03-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2023-03-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback