IL HR0066 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mourns the passing of Marvin E. Perzee and declares May 20, 2021 as "Marvin Perzee County Fair Day".
Title
MARVIN PERZEE COUNTY FAIR DAY
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=66&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0066.htm |