IL HR0061 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Calls on the United States to develop a policy that it will not be the first to use nuclear weapons.
Title
NUCLEAR WEAPON-NO FIRST USE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-07 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 016-011-000 |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=61&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0061.htm |