IL HR0058 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges municipalities within the State to reevaluate their Emerald Ash Borer (EAB) management plans.
Title
EAB MANAGEMENT PLANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2013-03-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 014-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=58&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0058.htm |