IL HR0056 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares June 27, 2017 as "Illinois Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day". Declares June of 2017 as "Illinois Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month". Urges the Department of Public Health and the Department of Veterans' Affairs to continue working to educate victims of abuse, crime, and natural disasters, and service members, veterans and their families, and the general public, about the causes, symptoms, and treatment of post-traumatic stress injury.
Title
PTSI DAY/MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=56&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0056.htm |