IL HR0056 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency to develop a cost-effective plan to more readily identify persons who are improperly disposing of used and waste tires.
Title
URGE IEPA-DEVELOP TIRE PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2011-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-04-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Environment & Energy Committee; 018-000-000 |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=56&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0056.htm |