IL HR0056 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 116-001-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 116-001-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the State Board of Education to establish a comprehensive plan to close the student achievement gap by the 2010-2011 school year.
Title
ISBE-CLOSE STU ACHIEVEMNT GAP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-30 | Resolution Adopted 116-001-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-04-22 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-04-22 | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaShawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=56&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0056.htm |