IL HR0042 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Resolution Adopted as Amended by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Resolution Adopted as Amended by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes February 25, 2009 as the inaugural Eating Disorders Awareness Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
EATING DISORDER AWARENESS DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Resolution Adopted as Amended by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-02-25 | Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |