IL HR0041 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares January 17, 2021 as Muhammad Ali Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
MUHAMMAD ALI DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-04-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-14 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=41&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0041.htm |