IL HR0040 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares January 31 through February 6, 2021 as Physician Anesthesiologists Week in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANESTHESIOLOGIST WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback