IL HR0032 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Resolution Adopted 116-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the intent to eradicate financial abuse of the elderly in Illinois. Urges the Illinois Department of Public Health and the Illinois Department of Aging to work together to produce educational materials for elderly citizens of Illinois explaining their rights, the warning signs of financial exploitation, and appropriate reporting methods. Urges the 13 Illinois Area Agencies on Aging Ombudsperson programs to partner with long-term care facilities in their respective regions to provide appropriate educational information and reporting methods to clients and patients on an annual basis. Urges the Illinois State Bar Association Elder Law Section to work to develop appropriate legal materials for long-term care facilities and State's Attorneys that offer information on identifying and prosecuting financial abuse of elderly citizens. Urges the Illinois State Medical Society and the Illinois Nurses Association to provide their respective members with appropriate educational materials to assist with identifying and reporting suspected financial abuse of Illinois' older citizens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELIMINATE ELDERLY ABUSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07HouseResolution Adopted 116-000-000
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-09HouseRecommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 013-000-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Aging Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback