IL HR0025 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges all branches of the medical profession to commit to eliminating racism and recognizing biases, all colleges and medical institutions that prepare students for careers in the medical profession to focus on the recruitment of more minorities, and the State Board of Higher Education to pursue and provide more scholarship opportunities for minority applicants seeking to enter all aspects of the medical profession.
Title
DISCRIMINATION IN MEDICINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-14 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-002-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=25&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0025.htm |