IL HR0015 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the 66th anniversary of the Hungarian Revolution and the sacrifices of the brave Hungarian freedom fighters and the great contributions of Hungarian-Americans in Illinois and reaffirms the friendship between the people and government of Illinois and the country of Hungary. Declares October 23, 2023 as "Hungarian Freedom Fighters Day" and declares October 2023 as "Hungarian Freedom Month".
Title
HUNGARIAN FREEDOM FIGHTERS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=15&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0015.htm |