IL HJRCA0060 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-02 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-02 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the boundaries of Legislative and Representative districts may be separate. Requires that both types of districts, in addition to being compact, contiguous, and substantially equal in population, must reflect minority voting strengths, promote competition, and consider political boundaries. Replaces the current method of redistricting of the Senate and House of Representatives with the following: a commission, appointed by the legislative leaders and in accordance with scoring criteria provided by law, shall score separate Legislative District and Representative District maps submitted by the public; the Senate and House, each by a three-fifths vote, shall adopt one of the 3 maps with the best scores for its districts; and the Secretary of State shall certify the map with the best score if a chamber fails to adopt a map. Specifies the schedule for redistricting activities. Effective upon being declared adopted and applicable to redistricting beginning in 2021 and to the election of General Assembly members beginning in 2022.
Title
CON AMEND-REDISTRICTING
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-02 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2016-09-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-09-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2016-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-09-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-09-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-09-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2016-09-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2016-09-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=60&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJRCA/09900HC0060.htm |