IL HJRCA0043 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-03 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution to provide that (i) the proclamation of results of each election of members of the General Assembly must take place as soon as practical after the general election, but in no case later than seven days prior to the date the General Assembly first convenes, (ii) the General Assembly shall convene each year on the second Wednesday of December, and (iii) the General Assembly may not be in session in any general election year from the date of the general election until the second Wednesday of December, except upon a joint proclamation stating the purpose of the session. Proposes to amend the Executive Article of the Illinois Constitution to provide that (i) the proclamation of results of each election of the Governor and Lieutenant Governor must take place as soon as practical after the general election, but in no case later than seven days prior to the date the General Assembly first convenes in accordance with specified provisions and (ii) the Governor and Lieutenant Governor shall hold office for four years beginning on the second Wednesday of December. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-GA/GOV TAKE OFFICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-03 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 |
2014-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2014-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2014-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=43&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJRCA/09800HC0043.htm |