IL HJRCA0041 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Removes the requirement for each Legislative District to be divided into 2 Representative Districts. Modifies provisions concerning legislative redistricting. Provides specified requirements for each Legislative District, Representative District, and Congressional District for redistricting purposes. Replaces the current method of legislative redistricting with a 17-member Commission, appointed by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court and the most senior Supreme Court Justice of a different political party in accordance with specified criteria. Specifies requirements for the Commission concerning redistricting plans. Adds provisions concerning the membership of the Commission and budgetary matters related to the Commission. Provides the Supreme Court with original and exclusive jurisdiction over redistricting matters. Defines terms. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective upon being declared adopted and applicable to redistricting beginning in 2021 and to the election of General Assembly members beginning in 2022.
Title
CON AMEND-REDISTRICTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=41&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJRCA/10100HC0041.htm |