IL HJRCA0034 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Legislature and Revenue Articles of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the General Assembly may increase the rate of an existing tax or impose a new tax only by a law approved by the vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house. Provides that the General Assembly may override the veto of the Governor of a bill to increase the rate of an existing tax or impose a new tax only by a record vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-TAX-2/3RDS VOTE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
2019-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-05-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseRead in Full a First Time
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-05-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-05-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback