IL HJRCA0012 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Revenue Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that individual income taxes may be at a graduated or a non-graduated rate. Provides that any such tax imposed on corporations shall be at a non-graduated rate, not to exceed the average of the lowest and highest individual rates by more than a ratio of 8 to 5. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-GRADUATED INC TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 46 |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2012-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-01-30 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=12&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJRCA/09700HC0012.htm |