IL HJRCA0011 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature and Revenue Articles of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the General Assembly may increase the rate of an existing tax or impose a new tax only by a law approved by the vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house. Provides that the General Assembly may override the veto of the Governor of a bill to increase the rate of an existing tax or impose a new tax only by a record vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each house. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-TAX-2/3RDS VOTE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=11&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HJRCA/10300HC0011.htm |