IL HJRCA0008 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Executive Article of the Illinois Constitution. Eliminates the Office of the Comptroller. Transfers the duties of the Comptroller to the Treasurer. Provides that the Treasurer shall (i) maintain the State's central fiscal accounts and order payments into and out of the funds held by him or her, (ii) be responsible for the safekeeping and investment of monies and securities deposited with him or her, and for their disbursement upon his or her order, and (iii) have the duties and powers that may be prescribed by law. Provides that no Comptroller shall be elected in 2026 and thereafter. Effective otherwise upon conclusion of the term of the Comptroller elected in 2022.
Title
CONAMEND-OFFICE OF COMPTROLLER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Read in Full a First Time |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=8&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HJRCA&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HJRCA/10300HC0008.htm |