IL HJR0153 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency, in coordination with the Department of Public Health, shall conduct a study of lead in Illinois drinking water describing the chemical and human health impacts of lead in Illinois piped water supplies. Provides that the Agency shall make weekly reports and publish them online. Provides that the Agency shall make a preliminary formal report by September 1, 2016, and a final report by January 1, 2017. Provides that each report shall be delivered to the Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the President of the Senate, the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives, and the Minority Leader of the Senate, and that each report shall be published online.
Title
EPA-STUDY-LEAD-DRINKING WATER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-001-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 012-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-05-23 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |