IL HJR0144 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Resolution Adopted 116-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Resolution Adopted 116-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to pass legislation to rename the Post Office Building in Aurora in honor of Ken Christy and his work in representing National Association of Letter Carriers Branch 219.
Title
URGE CONG - KEN CHRISTY P.O.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Resolution Adopted 116-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-05-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-04-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |