IL HJR0141 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Department of Natural Resources to develop protections as needed for all Illinois native gar species to ensure the long term viability of the shortnose gar, the longnose gar, the spotted gar, and the alligator gar, with particular protections developed for alligator gar. Urges the Illinois Department of Natural Resources to apply these protections as needed and include site specific size and creel limits based on the size of the reproductively mature gar to protect brood stock from premature harvest. Urges the Illinois Department of Natural Resources to work with partners to identify ways to expand and expedite the reintroduction of alligator gar to waterways to expedite the creation of a sustainable and regulated trophy fishing resource in the State.
Title
URGE DNR - GAR PROTECTIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Andrew Skoog [D] |
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Be Adopted Agriculture; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-12 | House | Resolution Adopted 114-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-04-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-13 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |