IL HJR0139 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Public Health to undertake a study coordinating with the University of Illinois at Chicago College of Pharmacy (Chicago and Rockford campuses), the Southern Illinois University Edwardsville School of Pharmacy, and the Chicago State University College of Pharmacy to determine the appropriateness of promoting and encouraging interprofessional communication between healthcare providers, physicians, nurse practitioners, physician's assistants, and pharmacists to facilitate more effective methods for transitioning care of a patient between the various healthcare settings or managing their medication regimens. Urges the Department of Public Health to examine and recommend solutions for a mechanism or process for electronically-prescribed prescription orders to electronically transmit "discontinuation", "cancel", or "stop" notifications to the pharmacy upon discontinuation or cancellation of the order. Urges the Department of Public Health to examine the overall benefits of mandated pharmacist-led medication reconciliation upon patient entrance into a new healthcare setting and patient discharge education upon transition to a new healthcare setting, follow-up communication with patients by healthcare providers after a specified period of time after transitioning, electronic communication to pharmacies whenever a change in medication occurs, and use of the primary care provider as a nexus for communication between healthcare providers, including pharmacists, to assure a centralized medication list is maintained for each patient.
Title
PRESCRIPTION DISCONTINUATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Be Adopted Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-001 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Resolution Adopted 113-000-000 |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-04-13 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |