IL HJR0120 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the 50th anniversary of the Special Olympics, celebrates the accomplishments of Justice Anne Burke, and congratulates all Special Olympic athletes, past and present, on their accomplishments.
Title
RECOGNIZE-SPECIAL OLYMPICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2018-04-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=120&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0120.htm |