IL HJR0092 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges every public and private university and community college in this State to extend their application deadlines for students currently enrolled at Lincoln College who are unable to continue their education at their institution due to circumstances beyond their control. Urges every public and private university and community college in this State to honor the credits earned by students from Lincoln College and have those credits be transferred accordingly. Urges Lincoln College to waive transcript fees from students currently enrolled. Urges all Illinois public and private universities and community colleges to attend Lincoln College's student transfer fair on April 14 to assist its students in finding another college to attend. Urges all Illinois public and private universities and community colleges to waive the application fees for students of Lincoln College. Urges all Illinois public and private universities and community colleges to attempt to match or exceed the financial award letters, including scholarships, of Lincoln College students. Encourages the Illinois Department of Employment Security and the Illinois Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to work with the displaced Lincoln College employees to ease their financial hardships and support their attempts to find new employment. Resolves to continue striving to provide better protections for Illinois' higher education students in the unfortunate event of a closure of an institution of higher learning in the State and to help provide a smooth transition for students and a path to continue pursue higher education in Illinois.
Title
LINCOLN COLL. STUDENTS-SUPPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-04-07 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-04-07 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-04-06 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-04-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=92&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HJR/10200HJ0092.htm |