IL HJR0090 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-EIGHTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, April 10, 2014, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Wednesday, April 16, 2014, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 29, 2014 at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Wednesday, April 23, 2014, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 29, 2014, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule ; 3-6(a) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Don Harmon; 3-6(a) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-04-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=90&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0090.htm |