IL HJR0087 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Illinois Route 148 north of the City of Christopher at the city limits north of the intersection of Harrison Street and Highway 148 and south of the City of Christopher at the northeast intersection of Yellow Banks Road and Illinois Route 148 as the "Firefighter Kody M. Vanfossan Memorial Highway."
Title
VANFOSSAN MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-04-06 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |