IL HJR0086 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-4)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges those in state government to commit to working to change the culture of racism within state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RACISM IN STATE GOVERNMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-07 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-11-07HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-11-07SenateResolution Adopted; 055-000-000
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-11-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-11-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-11-07SenateArrive in Senate
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-11-07HouseResolution Adopted 117-000-000
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-11-07HouseRecommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-11-07HouseRe-assigned to Rules Committee
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-11-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-11-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-11-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-11-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-11-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-11-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-11-02HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-11-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback