IL HJR0080 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to pass United States House Resolution 2574 to help insure an adequate number of health care professionals in all areas.
Title
CONGRESS-PASS U.S. HR 2574
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-10-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=80&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0080.htm |