IL HJR0070 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-NINTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, April 30, 2015, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 05, 2015 at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 05, 2015, or until the call of the President.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-30HouseAdopted Both Houses
2015-04-30SenateResolution Adopted
2015-04-30SenatePrevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a)
2015-04-30SenateMoved to Suspend Rule Sen. Terry Link; 3-6(a)
2015-04-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2015-04-30SenateArrive in Senate
2015-04-28HouseResolution Adopted
2015-04-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback