IL HJR0070 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-05 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-EIGHTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Wednesday, February 05, 2014, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Friday, February 07, 2014, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, February 10, 2014, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, February 13, 2014, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Friday, February 14, 2014, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 18, 2014, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 11, 2014, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 18, 2014, or until the call of the President.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-05HouseAdopted Both Houses
2014-02-05SenateResolution Adopted
2014-02-05SenatePrevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a)
2014-02-05SenateMoved to Suspend Rule Sen. Don Harmon; 3-6(a)
2014-02-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2014-02-05SenateArrive in Senate
2014-02-04HouseResolution Adopted
2014-02-04HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback